|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Public Act 12-63
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
House Calendar Number 451
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3841
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
File Number 203
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 177
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|