|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-154
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
House Calendar Number 515
|
|
|
|
05/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4732
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
File Number 243
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 202
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|