06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Public Act 12-208 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | House Passed | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/04/2012 | House Calendar Number 508 | |||
05/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/18/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/11/2012 | File Number 374 | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 275 | |||
04/04/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |