05/01/2012 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 337 | |||
04/10/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 262 | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |