Connecticut 2012 2012 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00395 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2012

                    General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 395
February Session, 2012  LCO No. 1418
 *01418_______HS_*
Referred to Committee on Human Services
Introduced by:
(HS)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 395 

February Session, 2012

LCO No. 1418

*01418_______HS_*

Referred to Committee on Human Services 

Introduced by:

(HS)

AN ACT INCREASING THE PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE FOR CERTAIN LONG-TERM CARE FACILITY RESIDENTS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 17b-106 of the 2012 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2012): 

(a) On January 1, 2006, and on each January first thereafter, the Commissioner of Social Services shall increase the unearned income disregard for recipients of the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program by an amount equal to the federal cost-of-living adjustment, if any, provided to recipients of federal Supplemental Security Income Program benefits for the corresponding calendar year. On July 1, 1989, and annually thereafter, the commissioner shall increase the adult payment standards over those of the previous fiscal year for the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program by the percentage increase, if any, in the most recent calendar year average in the consumer price index for urban consumers over the average for the previous calendar year, provided the annual increase, if any, shall not exceed five per cent, except that the adult payment standards for the fiscal years ending June 30, 1993, June 30, 1994, June 30, 1995, June 30, 1996, June 30, 1997, June 30, 1998, June 30, 1999, June 30, 2000, June 30, 2001, June 30, 2002, June 30, 2003, June 30, 2004, June 30, 2005, June 30, 2006, June 30, 2007, June 30, 2008, June 30, 2009, June 30, 2010, June 30, 2011, June 30, 2012, and June 30, 2013, shall not be increased. Effective October 1, 1991, the coverage of excess utility costs for recipients of the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program is eliminated. Notwithstanding the provisions of this section, the commissioner may increase the personal needs allowance component of the adult payment standard as necessary to meet federal maintenance of effort requirements.

(b) Effective July 1, [2011] 2012, the commissioner shall provide a state supplement payment for recipients of Medicaid and the federal Supplemental Security Income Program who reside in long-term care facilities sufficient to increase their personal needs allowance to [sixty] sixty-nine dollars per month. Effective July 1, 2012, and annually thereafter, the commissioner shall increase such allowance to reflect the annual inflation adjustment in Social Security income, if any. Such state supplement payment shall be made to the long-term care facility to be deposited into the personal fund account of each such recipient. For the purposes of this subsection, "long-term care facility" means a licensed chronic and convalescent nursing home, a chronic disease hospital, a rest home with nursing supervision, an intermediate care facility for the mentally retarded or a state humane institution. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2012 17b-106

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2012

17b-106

Statement of Purpose: 

To increase the personal needs allowance for certain long-term care facility residents. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]