Connecticut 2012 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00395 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 395
22 February Session, 2012 LCO No. 1418
33 *01418_______HS_*
44 Referred to Committee on Human Services
55 Introduced by:
66 (HS)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 395
1111
1212 February Session, 2012
1313
1414 LCO No. 1418
1515
1616 *01418_______HS_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on Human Services
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (HS)
2323
2424 AN ACT INCREASING THE PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE FOR CERTAIN LONG-TERM CARE FACILITY RESIDENTS.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 17b-106 of the 2012 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2012):
2929
3030 (a) On January 1, 2006, and on each January first thereafter, the Commissioner of Social Services shall increase the unearned income disregard for recipients of the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program by an amount equal to the federal cost-of-living adjustment, if any, provided to recipients of federal Supplemental Security Income Program benefits for the corresponding calendar year. On July 1, 1989, and annually thereafter, the commissioner shall increase the adult payment standards over those of the previous fiscal year for the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program by the percentage increase, if any, in the most recent calendar year average in the consumer price index for urban consumers over the average for the previous calendar year, provided the annual increase, if any, shall not exceed five per cent, except that the adult payment standards for the fiscal years ending June 30, 1993, June 30, 1994, June 30, 1995, June 30, 1996, June 30, 1997, June 30, 1998, June 30, 1999, June 30, 2000, June 30, 2001, June 30, 2002, June 30, 2003, June 30, 2004, June 30, 2005, June 30, 2006, June 30, 2007, June 30, 2008, June 30, 2009, June 30, 2010, June 30, 2011, June 30, 2012, and June 30, 2013, shall not be increased. Effective October 1, 1991, the coverage of excess utility costs for recipients of the state supplement to the federal Supplemental Security Income Program is eliminated. Notwithstanding the provisions of this section, the commissioner may increase the personal needs allowance component of the adult payment standard as necessary to meet federal maintenance of effort requirements.
3131
3232 (b) Effective July 1, [2011] 2012, the commissioner shall provide a state supplement payment for recipients of Medicaid and the federal Supplemental Security Income Program who reside in long-term care facilities sufficient to increase their personal needs allowance to [sixty] sixty-nine dollars per month. Effective July 1, 2012, and annually thereafter, the commissioner shall increase such allowance to reflect the annual inflation adjustment in Social Security income, if any. Such state supplement payment shall be made to the long-term care facility to be deposited into the personal fund account of each such recipient. For the purposes of this subsection, "long-term care facility" means a licensed chronic and convalescent nursing home, a chronic disease hospital, a rest home with nursing supervision, an intermediate care facility for the mentally retarded or a state humane institution.
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3838 Section 1 July 1, 2012 17b-106
3939
4040 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4141
4242 Section 1
4343
4444 July 1, 2012
4545
4646 17b-106
4747
4848 Statement of Purpose:
4949
5050 To increase the personal needs allowance for certain long-term care facility residents.
5151
5252 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]