05/07/2012 | House Calendar Number 527 | |||
05/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/07/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5276 | |||
04/23/2012 | File Number 578 | |||
04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 415 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/23/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |