04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 428 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 410 | |||
04/12/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 285 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/27/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/27/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |