|
05/08/2012
|
House Calendar Number 543
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5190
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
File Number 629
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 411
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 286
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|