04/26/2012 | Motion Failed JF | |||
04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/03/2012 | File Number 244 | |||
04/03/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 207 | |||
03/27/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/19/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |