04/25/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | |||
04/19/2012 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/11/2012 | File Number 376 | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 281 | |||
04/04/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |