|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Public Act 12-103
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
House Calendar Number 430
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3186
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
File Number 284
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 226
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|