05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/01/2012 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
05/01/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/30/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/30/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/30/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/18/2012 | File Number 530 | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 355 | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2012 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |