05/25/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 517 | |||
05/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/03/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4668 | |||
04/27/2012 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
04/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 536 | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 381 | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2012 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/13/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |