05/04/2012 | House Calendar Number 509 | |||
05/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/02/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3708 | |||
04/25/2012 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
04/25/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/25/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
04/17/2012 | File Number 473 | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 333 | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/29/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/14/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |