04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/17/2012 | File Number 475 | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 335 | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/30/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/14/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |