05/07/2012 | House Calendar Number 539 | |||
05/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/07/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/07/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 4794 | |||
05/02/2012 | Matter Pass Retained | |||
05/02/2012 | Bill Passed Temporarily | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
04/10/2012 | Rules Suspended | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 285 | |||
04/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 234 | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2012 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |