|
05/09/2012
|
House Calendar Number 548
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
File Number 378
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 283
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/21
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|