05/01/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 412 | |||
04/12/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 297 | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/19/2012 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |