04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 533 | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 382 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/19/2012 | Public Hearing 03/23 | |||
03/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |