04/20/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
04/04/2012 | Public Act 12-4 | |||
04/03/2012 | Signed by Governor in Original | |||
03/28/2012 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | |||
03/28/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
03/28/2012 | House Passed | |||
03/28/2012 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 2911 | |||
03/28/2012 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | |||
03/28/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
03/28/2012 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 2908 | |||
03/27/2012 | Emergency Certification |