House | 04/01/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Vote to Draft |