House | 05/08/2013 | File Number 766 | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | File Number 425 | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 278 | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2013 | Vote to Draft |