House
|
05/28/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Public Act 13-22
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
File Number 699
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 507
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6308
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 618
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Calendar Number 408
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|