Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05250 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 3, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013
Bill March 13, 2013