House
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-259
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 554
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
File Number 394
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
House Calendar Number 262
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|