Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 3, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013
Bill March 13, 2013