Senate | 07/11/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | Public Act 13-260 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 06/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 695 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2013 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | File Number 620 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Calendar Number 409 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |