House | 04/05/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |