House | 03/20/2013 | File Number 75 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | House Calendar Number 73 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 01/25/2013 | Public Hearing 01/30 | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 01/23/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2013 | Vote to Draft |