House | 05/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Public Act 13-33 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 337 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | File Number 100 | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | House Calendar Number 97 | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/25/2013 | Public Hearing 01/30 | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 01/23/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2013 | Vote to Draft |