House | 04/11/2013 | File Number 452 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | House Calendar Number 288 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/18/2013 | Vote to Draft |