House | 03/26/2013 | File Number 161 | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | House Calendar Number 124 | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |