House
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-162
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
File Number 857
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 659
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7686
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 621
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Calendar Number 410
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|