Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-261
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
File Number 880
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 679
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8174
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
File Number 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
House Calendar Number 55
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|