Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05475 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Proposed Bill No. 5475
22 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 1445
33 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
44 Introduced by:
55 REP. MILLER L., 122nd Dist.
66
77 General Assembly
88
99 Proposed Bill No. 5475
1010
1111 January Session, 2013
1212
1313 LCO No. 1445
1414
1515 Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY
1616
1717 Introduced by:
1818
1919 REP. MILLER L., 122nd Dist.
2020
2121 AN ACT EXTENDING RENEWABLE PORTFOLIO STANDARD DEADLINES.
2222
2323 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2424
2525 That section 16-245a of the general statutes be amended to extend the existing renewable portfolio standard deadlines for an electric supplier and an electric distribution company providing standard service or supplier of last resort service as follows: (1) The January 1, 2016, deadline is extended to January 1, 2017; (2) the January 1, 2017, deadline is extended to January 1, 2019; (3) the January 1, 2018, deadline is extended to January 1, 2021; (4) the January 1, 2019, deadline is extended to January 1, 2023; and (5) the January 1, 2020, deadline is extended to January 1, 2025.
2626
2727 Statement of Purpose:
2828
2929 To provide additional time for compliance with the renewable portfolio standard requirements by extending each deadline beginning in 2016.