House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Public Act 13-95
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
File Number 751
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 516
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6304
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
File Number 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
House Calendar Number 51
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|