House | 06/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Public Act 13-127 | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 349 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 278 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 188 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |