House | 06/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/11/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Public Act 13-165 | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 350 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | File Number 121 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 103 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |