House | 05/17/2013 | File Number 822 | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 610 | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7138 | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | No New File by Committee on Children | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Children | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | File Number 659 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Calendar Number 451 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |