House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 202 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 145 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
House | 01/28/2013 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 01/28/2013 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 01/25/2013 | Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 01/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |