House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 203 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 146 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |