House | 04/30/2013 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | File Number 397 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | House Calendar Number 265 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |