House | 05/16/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 598 | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6324 | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6335 | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | File Number 35 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | House Calendar Number 63 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Public Hearing 01/28 | ||
House | 01/23/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |