Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 707
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6681
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 624
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Calendar Number 413
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Public Hearing 01/28
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|