House
|
06/03/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Public Act 13-68
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 466
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 457
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
House Calendar Number 293
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|