Senate
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-215
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 703
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8691
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
File Number 165
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
House Calendar Number 128
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|