House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Recommitted to General Law
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
File Number 701
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 513
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5865
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
File Number 166
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
House Calendar Number 129
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|