House | 04/10/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | File Number 37 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | House Calendar Number 65 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Public Hearing 01/31 | ||
House | 01/23/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |