House | 06/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Public Act 13-130 | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 591 | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 356 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 235 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |